skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 02/12/22 18:20:26 PM

Clarke, Henry Courtenay Neville

CPSO#: 23081

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 04 Jan 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 4-Jan-2022

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education: Howard University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

DOCUDavit Solutions Inc.
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON  M6B 3Z4
Telephone: 416-781-9083
Telephone: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 19 Feb 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 04 Jan 2022