THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:47:52 PM
McCann, Thomas Joseph
CPSO#:
22997
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: T.J. McCann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can contact Docudavit Medical Solutions at: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 17 Sep 2019
Instructions/Address:Bronte Medical Group
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON L6L 6C5
Date Received: 26 Apr 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |