THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:55:58 PM
Hancock, David John
CPSO#:
22993
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Hancock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 2018 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jul 1991
Summary:
In July 1991, Dr. Hancock pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Hancock guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Hancock be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee further ruled that the Doctor's licence was to be suspended for a period of three months, with the second and third months of the suspension to be themselves suspended if he complied with a monitoring program for two years, as follows: a person, not from Dr. Hancock's hospital, satisfactory to the Registrar, was to review one week's emergency room charts per month, at random, the week to be the monitor's choice; and a report was to be submitted to the Registrar that would satisfy him that Dr. Hancock was maintaining the standard of practice.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1993-01-12
Hearing Date(s): 05 Jul 1991
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 23, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 23, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)