THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:26:56 AM
Marshall, Joseph Gilbert
CPSO#:
22908
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
31 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Write or call the above for medical record requests
Sue Garib
Unit 35 - 7000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y3
905 881 6510
Date Received: 10 Dec 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2018 |