THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:56:18 PM
Ballantyne, Robert Harry
CPSO#:
22866
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
27-Feb-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert Ballantyne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records at the New Vision Family Health Team are in possession of Dr. O'Brien
530 Columbia Street West
Waterloo, ON N2T 0B1; and
New Vision Family Health Team
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener, ON N2M 4K1
Date Received: 23 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2014 |