THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:45:18 AM
Catching, John David
CPSO#:
22816
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Wisconsin, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2021 |