skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 18:30:21 PM

Paterson, Ian Ross

CPSO#: 22764

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
707 Kipps Lane
London, Ontario
N5Y 3C3
Date Received: 06 Jan 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1992
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1992
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 06 Mar 1997
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2010

Previous Hearings

Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1992
Summary:

On June 8, 1992, the Fitness to Practice Committee found that Dr. Paterson is an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to subsection 63(1) of the Health Disciplines Act. On that date, the Fitness to Practice Committee ordered terms, conditions and limitations to be imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paterson.

On March 6, 1997, the Committee made an order amending these terms, conditions and limitations.

Appeal: No Appeal

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 31, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 31, 2010, Dr. Paterson has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.