THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:41:57 AM
Shantz, William Peter
CPSO#:
22732
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
11 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1970 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2007 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 11 Oct 2007 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jul 2007
Summary:
On July 25, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shantz committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Shantz is incompetent.
On October 11, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Shantz’s certificate of registration be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 09, 2007