skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 5:04:45 AM

Allen, Gillian Brook

CPSO#: 22684

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1970
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 Apr 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010