THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:35:40 AM
Joanes, Joseph Francisco
CPSO#:
22674
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Francis Joanes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |