skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 22:18:29 PM

Thirlwell, Michael Patrick

CPSO#: 22651

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McGill University Health Centre 1001Decarie Boulevard Montreal Quebec H4A 3J1
Date Received: 23 Jul 2021


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2021