THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:19:02 AM
Ahmad, Ghias
CPSO#:
22528
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: King Edward Medical College, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:7 Penwood Crescent
North York, ON M3B 3B1
Date Received: 12 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2016 |