skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 4:10:38 AM

Kontor, Jurgen Arthur

CPSO#: 22498

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Sep 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University Of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Kontor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007