skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/09/20 0:56:51 AM

Verbeek, Johannes Herbertus

CPSO#: 22494

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Dec 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
J.H. Verbeek
119 Pine Street South
Suite 310
Timmins ON  P4N 2K3
Phone: (705) 264-0031
Fax: (705) 264-7130 Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHANNES HERBERTUS VERBEEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBEEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1969