THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:01:44 AM
Orpin, John Alexander
CPSO#:
22454
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
20 Feb 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1969 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 20 Feb 1989 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1987
Summary:
In August 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Orpin guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Orpin(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1988-11-24
Hearing Date(s): 10 Aug 1987