THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:08:58 AM
Cassim, Essop Moosajee
CPSO#:
22410
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Oct 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English, Gujarati
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E.M. Cassim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2014 |