THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 22:47:21 PM
Perrin, Richard Goolden
CPSO#:
22324
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: Queen's University, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1273 Stoney Island RdClark's Harbour, NS B0W 1P0
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:23 Apr 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1969 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 17, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)