skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 17:47:03 PM

Handscomb, Arthur Robert George

CPSO#: 22288

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 2008
Summary:

On September 8, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Handscomb to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1) that Dr. Handscomb appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.

2) That Dr. Handscombe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by October 8, 2008.

3) Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2008