THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:08:28 PM
Tam, Robert Chi-Fan
CPSO#:
22200
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert C.F. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Glen Park Family Health
200-2920 Dufferin Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3S8
Date Received: 12 May 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact: Glen Park Family Health 200 - 2920 Dufferin St.,Toronto ON M6B 3S8 Tel: 416-782-2211
Date Received: 19 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |