THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:47:52 AM
Allen, Edward Charles
CPSO#:
22169
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Individuals looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Andy Gidwani.
Royal Health Care Centre
130 Adelaide Street West
Lower Concourse
PO Box 92
Toronto, ON M5H 3P5
Tel: 416 361 6142
Date Received: 05 Nov 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |