THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:17:18 PM
Riopelle, Richard John
CPSO#:
22161
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
20-174 Dufferin Rd
Ottawa ON K1M 2A6
Phone: 613.421.7519
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN RIOPELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIOPELLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1977 |