skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/21 23:59:09 PM

Martin, Paul Brubacher

CPSO#: 22122

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Mar 2011
Summary:

On March 25, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Paul Brubacher Martin committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession in respect of his prescribing of narcotics to fifteen patients. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Martin's 
            Certificate of Registration: 
(a)   Dr. Martin shall not prescribe any drug that is: 
(i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs 
            and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
(ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled 
            Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, 
            S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or 
 
(iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
      Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) 
 
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals 
and Specialties] is attached to the Order as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are 
attached to the Order as Schedule "B") 
 
(b)   Dr. Martin shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) in the form 
            set out at Schedule "C" (to the Order).  For further clarity, this sign shall state as 
      follows:   "Dr. Martin is prohibited from prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic 
      Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances." 
(c)   Dr. Martin shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
            charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring 
      and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order; and 
(d)   Dr. Martin shall complete the first available course in Medical Record Keeping for 
            Physicians offered by the College, including the follow-up portion of that course. 
 
2.    Dr. Martin pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days 
            from the date of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Martin appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
       


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): March 25, 2011