skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 10:31:24 AM

Stone, Peter Clifford Anthony

CPSO#: 22088

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
12 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Email: [email protected]
RSRS
111 St Regis Cres S
Toronto ON  M3J 1Y6
1-888-563-3732 ext 1
Date Received: 11 May 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:23 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 May 2021