THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:57:54 AM
Haka-Ikse, Katerina
CPSO#:
22074
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek
Education: National and Kapodistrian Univ of Athens, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Fax: 1 888 316 4125
Date Received: 17 Apr 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Katerina Haka-Ikse to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
(i) Dr. Haka-Ikse will be retiring from the practice of medicine no later than April 15, 2014; and
(ii) Until her retirement, Dr. Haka-Ikse will not be taking on any new patients.