THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:46:21 PM
Islur, Mruthyunjayappa
CPSO#:
22070
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada
Education: Mysore University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry,ca
Date Received: 16 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1965 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jan 2019 |