THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:38:56 PM
Tao, Hardy Hak-De
CPSO#:
22050
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Aug 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: National Taiwan University, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Feb 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2016 |