skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 13:02:55 PM

Handley, David George

CPSO#: 22001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr Marina Beshay B12-411 Bayfield St Barrie ON L4M 6G5
Date Received: 28 May 2019


Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Suite 302 125 Bell Farm Road Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Date Received: 21 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David George Handley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 25, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Handley engaged in sexual abuse of a patient. During the investigation, Dr. Handley resigned from the College and has agreed to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)