THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:21:56 PM
Kopplin, Peter Arthur
CPSO#:
21962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1969
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
602 Melita Crescent
Toronto ON M6G 3Z5
Phone: (416) 530-4482
Fax: 416 530-1686
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER ARTHUR KOPPLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPLIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1963 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1969 |