THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:27:07 AM
Asselstine, Robert Charles
CPSO#:
21906
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Asselstine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 18 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jun 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1997 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2016 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 12 Jun 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 9, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Asselstine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 9, 2021:
Dr. Asselstine has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)