THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:48:44 AM
Pakes, Eddy Hymie
CPSO#:
21893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Oct 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
82 Palm Dr
North York ON M3H 2C1
Phone: 4162787619
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDDY HYMIE PAKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAKES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1969 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2000 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 10 Oct 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 2000
Summary:
On May 25, 2000 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pakes( plea of guilty to professional misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise and the Committee found him guilty of said charge.
On August 8, 2000, the Discipline Committee released its decision and reasons on penalty and ordered the following:
a) Dr. Pakes be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register
b) The Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Pakes( certificate of registration for a period of three months, to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar
c) Dr. Pakes shall pay a fine of $10,000.00 to the Minister of Finance within 30 days of commencing his suspension
d) Dr. Pakes shall pay costs to the Colege in the amount of $2500.00 within 30 days of commencing his suspension
e) Two months of the suspension ordered shall be suspended, provided that paragraphs (c) and (d) above are complied with
f) In the event that Dr. Pakes fails to comply with paragraphs (c) or (d), then the balance of his suspension will be served to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2000