THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:23:02 AM
Sabga, Edward Anthony
CPSO#:
21886
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:04 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1999 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 28, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Edward Anthony Sabga to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Edward A. Sabga:
2). Hereby resign from the College, effective September 1, 2009.
3). Undertake not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
4). Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as public information.
5). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated June 29, 2009 (the “Notice”) for failure to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and incompetence in my care and treatment of Patient “A”.
6). By entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice.
7). Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice.