THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:12:30 AM
Wilansky, Douglas Leo
CPSO#:
21838
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Apr 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All Internal Medicine clinical records have been destroyed.
Etobicoke General Hospital
Nuclear Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke, ON M9V 1R8
Date Received: 08 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1955 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |