THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:53:53 AM
Fellows, George Fraser
CPSO#:
21836
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Apr 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Fraser Fellows Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioner Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 30 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:17 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2018 |