THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:33:07 PM
Hoffenberg, Ronald Leon
CPSO#:
21835
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Mar 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:15 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |