THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:46:10 AM
Cheung, Wai Ming
CPSO#:
21814
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
03 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Mar 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:
Dr. W.M. Cheung
Fax: 905-764-1307
Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:
PO Box 87674
298 John Street
Thornhill, ON
L3T 7R4
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013
Instructions/Address:Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:
390 Highlen Avenue
Markham, ON
L3S 4J3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013
Instructions/Address:Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact:
Dr. W.M. Cheung
Fax: 905-764-1307
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 1969 |
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |