THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:58:11 AM
Thomson, Bruce Willard
CPSO#:
21788
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jan 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bruce Willard Thomson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 16, 2019:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Thomson engaged in professional misconduct, including sexual abuse of a patient, or is incompetent. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Thomson resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)