skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 12:54:43 PM

Petrie, Ian Buchan

CPSO#: 21742

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Dec 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Edinburgh, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: I.B. Petrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 1989
Summary:

In March 1988, Dr. Petrie had been found guilty by the Discipline Committee of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); and in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). Dr. Petrie appealed this decision, and Divisional Court, while upholding the Discipline Committee(s verdict of guilt, ordered that the matter be returned to the Committee for re-hearing of submissions as to penalty. Consequently, a new penalty Hearing was held in March 1989. At the close of this Hearing the Committee ordered that Dr. Petrie be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. It was further ordered that Dr. Petrie(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months, but that this suspension would itself be suspended if he agreed to the carrying out of an investigation of his practice of the kind contemplated by s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Mar 1989