THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:46:08 PM
Richards, Frank
CPSO#:
21715
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Mar 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-Feb-2004
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1989 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jun 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 1989
Summary:
In March 1989, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Richards guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Richards be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that there be a permanent restriction on the Doctor's licence, to the effect that he be prohibited from practicing anaesthesia.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 06 Mar 1989