THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:36:03 PM
Porter, Jean Evelyn
CPSO#:
21687
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jean E. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 416-258-5734 or 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2021 |