THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:18:26 AM
Becker, Edna Jean
CPSO#:
21666
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Sep 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Edna Becker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All requests for medical records should be directed to the hospitals at which the patient was treated.
Date Received: 03 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:07 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |