THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:18:09 AM
Grossman, Lawrence
CPSO#:
21663
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
11 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Polyclinic
2 Chanoagne Dr
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:17 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2019 |