THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:15:20 AM
Dunn, James Michael
CPSO#:
21626
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
12 Jan 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Mar 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1968 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 25 Sep 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Apr 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Nov 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1986 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Jan 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jan 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1987 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 18 Jan 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1988 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 1996 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 12 Jan 1998 |