THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:01:38 AM
Barron, Philip Thomson
CPSO#:
21599
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Philip Thomson Barron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 26 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |