THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:43:56 AM
Osborne, Ronald Julian
CPSO#:
21559
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 1998 |