THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/10/23 10:02:02 AM
Wyant, John Derek
CPSO#:
21542
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-Dec-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Date Received: 11 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2020 |