THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:10:32 AM
Manley, Paul Nathan
CPSO#:
21495
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul N. Manley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:21 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Sep 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2023 |