THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 1:00:53 AM
Slesers, Aris
CPSO#:
21453
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
04 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Latvian
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: April 30, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 30, 2004, Dr. Aris Slesers undertook to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
Ontario the following,
-- that he has ceased to practise medicine and will not practise medicine in any jurisdiction.