THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:30:24 AM
Varty, Christopher Bruce
CPSO#:
21375
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact the hospital: Rouge Valley Centenary, 2867 Ellesmere Rd, Scarborough, ON, M1E 4B9 or via telephone at 416-284-8131.
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: November 17, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES:
On December 2, 2008, Credit Valley Hospital notified the College that Dr. Christopher Bruce Varty's privileges were suspended, effective November 17, 2008.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |