THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:05:56 AM
Quinn, Leo Peter
CPSO#:
21368
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L. Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012
Corporation Name: Leo Quinn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gib St
Oshawa, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 03 Jul 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jul 2018 |