THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:18:31 AM
Rapoport, David
CPSO#:
21356
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
09 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records are with Dr. S.E Parker
Suite 303
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M3H 3S3
Date Received: 07 Apr 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1976 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2017 |